TN SB2076 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reduces, from 29.0141 percent to 28.5262 percent, the share of state sales and use tax revenue deposited to the state general fund; increases, from 4.6030 percent to 5.0909 percent, the share appropriated to municipalities. - Amends TCA Section 67-6-103.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 67-6-103, relative to distribution of revenues.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Briggs [R] | Sen. Brian Kelsey [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] | Sen. Steve Southerland [R] |
Sen. Page Walley [R] | Sen. Art Swann [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/20/2022 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/20/2022 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/19/2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ negative recommendation |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Refer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2012 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee