TN SB2071 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-06 - Pub. Ch. 626
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-06 - Pub. Ch. 626
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the department of health to recognize ST-elevation myocardial infarction (STEMI) receiving and STEMI referring hospitals; requires ambulance services to develop and implement pre-hospital care protocol plans related to the assessment, treatment, and transport of STEMI heart attack patients; enacts related provisions. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 11 and Title 68, Chapter 140.
Title
As enacted, requires the department of health to recognize ST-elevation myocardial infarction (STEMI) receiving and STEMI referring hospitals; requires ambulance services to develop and implement pre-hospital care protocol plans related to the assessment, treatment, and transport of STEMI heart attack patients; enacts related provisions. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 11 and Title 68, Chapter 140.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Briggs [R] | Sen. Janince Bowling [R] | Sen. Joseph Hensley [R] | Sen. Edward Jackson [R] |
Sen. Becky Massey [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Concur in House Amend# 1 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-14 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-14 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-06 | Pub. Ch. 626 | |
2018-04-06 | Effective date(s) 04/02/2018 | |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2018-03-22 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 30, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0758) |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 3/19/2018 |
2018-03-12 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-03-12 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0758) |
2018-03-12 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2018-02-26 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 28, Nays 0 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0589) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 2/22/2018 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/14/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2209 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 626