TN SB2068 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-01 - Pub. Ch. 496
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-01 - Pub. Ch. 496
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes county conservation boards, upon majority vote of membership, to meet no less frequently than quarterly rather than monthly. - Amends TCA Section 11-21-103.
Title
As enacted, authorizes county conservation boards, upon majority vote of membership, to meet no less frequently than quarterly rather than monthly. - Amends TCA Section 11-21-103.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-07 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-07 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-01 | Pub. Ch. 496 | |
2009-07-01 | Effective date(s) 06/23/09 | |
2009-06-23 | Signed by Governor. | |
2009-06-12 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2009-06-09 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2009-06-08 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2009-06-08 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2009-06-04 | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 1 | |
2009-06-04 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2009-04-13 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2009-04-09 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2009-04-09 | Passed S., Ayes 33, Nays 0 | |
2009-04-07 | Placed on Sen. Consent Calendar (2) cal. for 04/09/2009 | |
2009-04-07 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 04/07/2009 | |
2009-02-26 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2009-02-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-25 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1958 (Crossfiled) 2009-07-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 496