TN SB2064 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 736
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, revises provisions governing participation in the Tennessee consolidated retirement system by county judges and county officials; makes other revisions regarding participation in the system. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 34; Title 8, Chapter 35; Title 8, Chapter 36; Title 8, Chapter 37 and Section 17-2-305.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, revises provisions governing participation in the Tennessee consolidated retirement system by county judges and county officials; makes other revisions regarding participation in the system. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 34; Title 8, Chapter 35; Title 8, Chapter 36; Title 8, Chapter 37 and Section 17-2-305.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-13 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23 Pub. Ch. 736
2018-04-23 Effective date(s) 04/18/2018
2018-04-18SenateSigned by Governor.
2018-04-06SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2018-04-05HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2018-04-04SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2018-04-04SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2018-04-02HousePassed H., Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 0
2018-04-02HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2018-03-22HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2018-03-20SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2018-03-19SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2018-03-16SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/19/2018
2018-03-13SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2018-03-12SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/13/2018
2018-03-12SenateRule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 3-13-18
2018-03-06SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 3/13/2018
2018-02-28SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/6/2018
2018-02-01SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2018-01-31SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2018-01-30SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2056 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 736

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback