TN SB2063 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-02 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-02 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, directs the governor to seek a new TennCare waiver within 180 days of the effective date of this act to provide medical assistance coverage for the same population groups and services as the Insure Tennessee proposal; clarifies that the amendment takes effect upon federal approval. - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapter 5.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 71, Chapter 5, relative to medicaid expansion.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-02 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2104 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-22 - Failed in s/c Insurance Subcommittee of Insurance Committee