TN SB2062 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes from March 1 to April 1 the date by which the department of safety must submit an annual seizure report to the speakers of the senate and house of representatives and to the chairs of the judiciary committee of the senate, civil justice committee of the house of representatives, and criminal justice committee of the house of representatives. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 14; Title 8, Chapter 7; Title 38, Chapter 6; Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4; Title 40 and Title 55, Chapter 10, Part 4.
Title
As introduced, changes from March 1 to April 1 the date by which the department of safety must submit an annual seizure report to the speakers of the senate and house of representatives and to the chairs of the judiciary committee of the senate, civil justice committee of the house of representatives, and criminal justice committee of the house of representatives. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 14; Title 8, Chapter 7; Title 38, Chapter 6; Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4; Title 40 and Title 55, Chapter 10, Part 4.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/3/2018 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2111 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Failed in Finance, Ways & Means Committee