TN SB2062 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Pub. Ch. 635
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, enacts the "Asbestos Bankruptcy Trust Claims Transparency Act" and the "Asbestos Claims Priorities Act." - Amends TCA Title 28 and Title 29, Chapter 34.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, enacts the "Asbestos Bankruptcy Trust Claims Transparency Act" and the "Asbestos Claims Priorities Act." - Amends TCA Title 28 and Title 29, Chapter 34.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-31 Pub. Ch. 635
2016-03-31 Effective date(s) 07/01/2016
2016-03-23SenateSigned by Governor.
2016-03-15SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2016-03-15HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2016-03-14SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2016-03-14SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2016-03-10HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2016-03-10HousePassed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0
2016-03-10HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0642)
2016-03-10HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2016-03-09SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2016-03-09SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0
2016-03-09SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0638)
2016-03-07SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/9/2016
2016-03-01SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2016-02-24SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/1/2016
2016-01-25SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2016-01-21SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2016-01-21SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2234 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-31 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 635

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback