TN SB2056 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department to offer a former property owner of real property obtained through eminent domain the ability to repurchase the property at the price paid to the former owner if the department has not used the property in the previous 20 years. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 12; Title 29 and Title 54.
Title
As introduced, requires the department to offer a former property owner of real property obtained through eminent domain the ability to repurchase the property at the price paid to the former owner if the department has not used the property in the previous 20 years. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 12; Title 29 and Title 54.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2020 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-10 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee