TN SB2043 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-24 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Ed. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-24 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Ed. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department of education to adopt and publish, by August 1, 2014, uniform guidelines to be used by local education agencies in which a charter school operates in submitting their annual reports listing underutilized and vacant properties. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, requires the department of education to adopt and publish, by August 1, 2014, uniform guidelines to be used by local education agencies in which a charter school operates in submitting their annual reports listing underutilized and vacant properties. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Kelsey [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-24 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Ed. Comm. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/24/2014 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 3/24/2014 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/19/2014 |
2014-01-29 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1932 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-08 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Education Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2043&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB2043.pdf |