TN SB2039 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 971
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 971
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, permits a student with a documented learning disability who is unable to take 12 semester hours as required for the Tennessee Promise scholarship to be eligible for the scholarship. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4.
Title
As enacted, permits a student with a documented learning disability who is unable to take 12 semester hours as required for the Tennessee Promise scholarship to be eligible for the scholarship. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
Sen. Lee Harris [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Pub. Ch. 971 | |
2016-05-02 | Effective date(s) 04/27/2016 | |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2016-04-21 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2016-04-19 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 2, PNV 0 |
2016-04-19 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2016-03-03 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 2/29/2016 |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/17/2016 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2505 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 971