TN SB2034 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-03 - Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 12/1/2020
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-03 - Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 12/1/2020
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes obsolete language describing a polysomnographic professional standards committee that met annually from 2007-2010 to allow public discussion of new developments in the practice of polysomnography. - Amends TCA Title 63.
Title
As introduced, removes obsolete language describing a polysomnographic professional standards committee that met annually from 2007-2010 to allow public discussion of new developments in the practice of polysomnography. - Amends TCA Title 63.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-03 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 12/1/2020 |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 6/3/2020 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/25/2020 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/9/2020 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2085 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-02 - Taken off notice for cal. in Health Committee