TN SB2032 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 710
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 710
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires that the parent educational seminar include at least one 30-minute video on adverse childhood experiences created by the department of children's services in conjunction with the commission on children and youth or as part of the Building Strong Brains Tennessee public awareness campaign; adds to that the requirement of attendance by parents at the parent educational seminar may be waived upon motion by either party and the agreement of the court upon the showing of good cause. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 6.
Title
As enacted, requires that the parent educational seminar include at least one 30-minute video on adverse childhood experiences created by the department of children's services in conjunction with the commission on children and youth or as part of the Building Strong Brains Tennessee public awareness campaign; adds to that the requirement of attendance by parents at the parent educational seminar may be waived upon motion by either party and the agreement of the court upon the showing of good cause. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Rose [R] | Sen. Katrina Robinson [D] | Sen. Raumesh Akbari [D] | Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 710 | |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 6/11/2020 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2588 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 710