TN SB2032 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the commissioner of health to study and report on recommendations for legislation concerning telehealth and telemedicine under existing statutes to the health committee of the house of representatives and the health and welfare committee of the senate by January 15, 2019. - Amends TCA Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, requires the commissioner of health to study and report on recommendations for legislation concerning telehealth and telemedicine under existing statutes to the health committee of the house of representatives and the health and welfare committee of the senate by January 15, 2019. - Amends TCA Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Green [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/13/2018 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2091 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee