TN SB2030 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 754
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, specifies that documents provided through a website with the primary function of providing certificates, registrations, licenses, or similar documents for assistance animals in exchange for payment of a fee are not reliable documentation in seeking an exemption to a prohibition on animals in rental property. - Amends TCA Title 29 and Title 66.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 29 and Title 66, relative to service and support animals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-01 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 754
2024-04-01SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2024-03-28SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/1/2024
2024-03-27SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2024-03-20SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/27/2024
2024-03-12SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/13/2024
2024-03-12SenateAction deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/13/2024
2024-03-08SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/12/2024
2024-03-06SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/12/2024
2024-01-31SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2024-01-29SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2024-01-25SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2266 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-01 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2024

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback