TN SB2027 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-02 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-02 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the department of revenue to provide information about special license plates with any website renewal, send other notifications about these plates by electronic means, and provide information about these plates through any other web-based means. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 55, Chapter 4, relative to license plates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-02 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2237 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee