TN SB2020 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Sustainable Agriculture Advancement Act" to define "sustainable agriculture," require creation of an office of sustainable agriculture, require higher education institutions to provide educational programs and other assistance, and require the commissioner of agriculture to consider the impact of administrative action on sustainable agriculture. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 43; Title 44 and Title 53.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Sustainable Agriculture Advancement Act" to define "sustainable agriculture," require creation of an office of sustainable agriculture, require higher education institutions to provide educational programs and other assistance, and require the commissioner of agriculture to consider the impact of administrative action on sustainable agriculture. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 43; Title 44 and Title 53.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-03SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
2020-01-30SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2020-01-29SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2063 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-10 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee of Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback