TN SB2019 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Pub. Ch. 793
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Pub. Ch. 793
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the state treasurer to remit certain funds to telephone cooperatives. - Amends TCA Title 65 and Title 66.
Title
As enacted, requires the state treasurer to remit certain funds to telephone cooperatives. - Amends TCA Title 65 and Title 66.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Pub. Ch. 793 | |
2020-07-22 | Effective date(s) 07/15/2020 | |
2020-07-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-07-06 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-06-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-06-18 | House | Passed H., Ayes 88, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-06-18 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0602) |
2020-06-18 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2020-03-05 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0536) |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/2/2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2053 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 793