TN SB2018 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/3/2020
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/3/2020
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires that the commission report each year to the members of the general assembly the number of licensed manufacturers providing alcohol samples on premises. - Amends TCA Section 57-3-202(i)(1).
Title
As introduced, requires that the commission report each year to the members of the general assembly the number of licensed manufacturers providing alcohol samples on premises. - Amends TCA Section 57-3-202(i)(1).
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2064 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Committee