TN SB2018 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires LEAs to create a policy to allow a parent or a parent's designee to observe instruction and other school activities involving the parent's student upon request. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, requires LEAs to create a policy to allow a parent or a parent's designee to observe instruction and other school activities involving the parent's student upon request. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/21/2018 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2005 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee of Education Instruction & Programs