TN SB2013 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 937
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, revises the teacher code of ethics; requires annual professional development for teachers on the teacher code of ethics; requires teacher preparation programs to include training for all students on the teacher code of ethics. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2; Title 49, Chapter 5 and Title 49, Chapter 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, revises the teacher code of ethics; requires annual professional development for teachers on the teacher code of ethics; requires teacher preparation programs to include training for all students on the teacher code of ethics. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2; Title 49, Chapter 5 and Title 49, Chapter 6.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 2 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-21 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18 Pub. Ch. 937
2018-05-18 Effective date(s) 07/01/2018
2018-05-15SenateSigned by Governor.
2018-05-07SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2018-04-25HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2018-04-25SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2018-04-25SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2018-04-23SenateConcurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0 (Amendment 2 - HA0982)
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/23/2018
2018-04-19HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0
2018-04-19HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0982)
2018-04-19HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0981)
2018-04-19HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2018-03-05HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2018-03-01SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2018-03-01SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2018-03-01SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 28, Nays 0
2018-03-01SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0623)
2018-02-27SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/1/2018
2018-02-21SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2018-02-15SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/21/2018
2018-02-01SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2018-01-31SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2018-01-30SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2165 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 937

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback