TN SB2008 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 773
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 773
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Down Syndrome Information Act of 2018". - Amends TCA Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Down Syndrome Information Act of 2018". - Amends TCA Title 63 and Title 68.
Sponsors
Sen. Becky Massey [R] | Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] | Sen. Steven Dickerson [R] | Sen. Richard Briggs [R] |
Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Sen. Bo Watson [R] | Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 773 | |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/2/2018 |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar 4/2/18 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/29/2018 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health & Welfare Committee to 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2053 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 773