TN SB2004 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the Tennessee state veterans' homes board to name, subject to the governor's approval, the campus, buildings, facilities, and grounds of any state veterans' home; authorizes the administrator of each veterans' home to name any portion of the state veterans' home. - Amends TCA Title 58, Chapter 7.
Title
As introduced, authorizes the Tennessee state veterans' homes board to name, subject to the governor's approval, the campus, buildings, facilities, and grounds of any state veterans' home; authorizes the administrator of each veterans' home to name any portion of the state veterans' home. - Amends TCA Title 58, Chapter 7.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/27/2018 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2657 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-28 - Def. to Summer Study in State Government Subcommittee