TN SB1996 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires notice to be in two newspapers, instead of one newspaper, in the district when an election is held to fill a vacancy in the office of district public defender. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 14 and Title 9, Chapter 4.
Title
As introduced, requires notice to be in two newspapers, instead of one newspaper, in the district when an election is held to fill a vacancy in the office of district public defender. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 14 and Title 9, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/17/2020 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1915 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-26 - Taken off notice for cal. in Judiciary Committee