TN SB1989 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-24 - Re-refer to Senate Calendar Committee
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-24 - Re-refer to Senate Calendar Committee
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, revises certain circumstances under which the commissioner of revenue must not include or retain a non-participating manufacturer in the directory of certified tobacco product manufacturers. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4.
Title
As introduced, revises certain circumstances under which the commissioner of revenue must not include or retain a non-participating manufacturer in the directory of certified tobacco product manufacturers. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 calendar for 4/24/2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/24/2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 4/24/2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2154 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-18 - Def. to TACIR in Finance, Ways & Means Committee