TN SB1988 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, creates three additional trial courts in the 30th judicial district. - Amends TCA Title 16, Chapter 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 16, Chapter 2, relative to judicial districts.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-27SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
2024-02-21SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/27/2024
2024-02-20SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/27/2024
2024-02-13SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/20/2024
2024-01-31SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2024-01-29SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2024-01-25SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2139 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-31 - Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback