TN SB1987 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a cooperative to provide written notice to other cooperatives supplying cable, video, or broadband services to customers in the service area of any new construction or development of the dates on which open trenching will be available for the other providers to install equipment at their own expense. - Amends TCA Title 65, Chapter 25.
Title
As introduced, requires a cooperative to provide written notice to other cooperatives supplying cable, video, or broadband services to customers in the service area of any new construction or development of the dates on which open trenching will be available for the other providers to install equipment at their own expense. - Amends TCA Title 65, Chapter 25.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2662 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-26 - Failed for lack of motion in: Utilities Subcommittee