TN SB1981 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, makes appropriations for educator preparation programs for the fiscal years beginning July 1, 2019, and July 1, 2020. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 9 and Title 49.
Title
As introduced, makes appropriations for educator preparation programs for the fiscal years beginning July 1, 2019, and July 1, 2020. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 9 and Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |