TN SB1977 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Pub. Ch. 649
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Pub. Ch. 649
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises the distance parameter for the prohibition on a hypodermic syringe exchange program being operated within 2,000 feet of a school or park to make the parameter 1,000 feet in Nashville/Davidson County and in Chattanooga, Knoxville, and Memphis. - Amends TCA Title 68.
Title
As enacted, revises the distance parameter for the prohibition on a hypodermic syringe exchange program being operated within 2,000 feet of a school or park to make the parameter 1,000 feet in Nashville/Davidson County and in Chattanooga, Knoxville, and Memphis. - Amends TCA Title 68.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 83 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-07 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-07 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | Pub. Ch. 649 | |
2018-04-11 | Effective date(s) 04/09/2018 | |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2018-03-29 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-03-26 | House | Passed H. Ayes 83, Nays 11, PNV 0 |
2018-03-26 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0933) |
2018-03-26 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2018-03-26 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 27, Nays 2 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0722) |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/22/2018 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2180 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 649