TN SB1973 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 632
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 632
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the executive director of the student assistance corporation to temporarily suspend, modify, or waive deadlines or other non-academic eligibility requirements for student financial aid programs, if the governor has declared a state of emergency. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As enacted, authorizes the executive director of the student assistance corporation to temporarily suspend, modify, or waive deadlines or other non-academic eligibility requirements for student financial aid programs, if the governor has declared a state of emergency. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 632 | |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/19/2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. Education Comm. 3/18/20 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/11/2020 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2472 (Crossfiled) 2020-04-06 - Pub. Ch. 632