TN SB1971 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 913
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 913
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates a streamlined process for certain public officials to contest liens on real property that they believe to lack any legal basis. - Amends TCA Section 47-9-513 and Title 66, Chapter 21, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, creates a streamlined process for certain public officials to contest liens on real property that they believe to lack any legal basis. - Amends TCA Section 47-9-513 and Title 66, Chapter 21, Part 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-21 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-21 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Pub. Ch. 913 | |
2018-05-08 | Effective date(s) 05/01/2018; 07/01/2018 | |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2018-04-19 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-19 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-04-17 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-04-17 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA1056) |
2018-04-17 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2018-03-29 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 28, Nays 1 |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0903) |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/26/2018 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/20/2018 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1772 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 913