TN SB1965 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires employees and contractors of the department of transportation and first responders to wear blaze orange vests with reflective tape when working on roads and highways; prohibits all other colored vests; requires the department of safety to provide training on proper interstate incident traffic control to each police officer in a department that contains in its jurisdiction an interstate highway. - Amends TCA Title 38; Title 54; Title 55; Title 68, Chapter 102 and Title 68, Chapter 140.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 38; Title 54; Title 55; Title 68, Chapter 102 and Title 68, Chapter 140, relative to road safety.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1861 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-02 - Withdrawn.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1965&ga=112 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/112/Bill/SB1965.pdf |