TN SB1965 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, limits amount candidate may personally loan campaign per election, but does not limit amount candidate may contribute to campaign. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 10.
Title
As introduced, limits amount candidate may personally loan campaign per election, but does not limit amount candidate may contribute to campaign. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 10.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Rep. Bill Dunn [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-01 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Senate | Withdrawn. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/17/2014 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | S. Reset to Heel of Last Calendar of 2014 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/16/2014 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | S. Reset for Heel of Last Calendar of 2014 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/15/2014 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | S. Reset on Cal. for 4/15/2014 |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/14/2014 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | S. Reset on Cal. for 4/14/2014 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/10/2014 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | S. Reset on Cal. for 4/10/2014 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/9/2014 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 4/1/2014 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 4/1/2014 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/26/2014 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. S&L Govt. Comm. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 2/25/2014 |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 2/25/2014 |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 2/4/2014 |
2014-01-27 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1553 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-03 - Rcvd. from H., P1C.