TN SB1963 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a life, accident, hospitalization, or health insurance company doing business in this state that solicits applications or offers for contracts or contracts of insurance primarily by internet to provide at least one office for the handling of claims in Memphis, Nashville, Knoxville, or Chattanooga. - Amends TCA Title 56.
Title
As introduced, requires a life, accident, hospitalization, or health insurance company doing business in this state that solicits applications or offers for contracts or contracts of insurance primarily by internet to provide at least one office for the handling of claims in Memphis, Nashville, Knoxville, or Chattanooga. - Amends TCA Title 56.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/13/2018 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2263 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-05 - Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee