TN SB1962 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 576
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 576
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires a county legislative body to make revenue estimates and determine the level of revenue necessary to establish a budget for the operation of county schools that is at least equal to the minimum budget required to comply with the local match and maintenance of effort provisions of the BEP; requires the director of schools and the chair of the local board of education to prepare a budget according to the revenue estimates and revenue determinations made by the county legislative body. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 2.
Title
As enacted, requires a county legislative body to make revenue estimates and determine the level of revenue necessary to establish a budget for the operation of county schools that is at least equal to the minimum budget required to comply with the local match and maintenance of effort provisions of the BEP; requires the director of schools and the chair of the local board of education to prepare a budget according to the revenue estimates and revenue determinations made by the county legislative body. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 2.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 79 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | Pub. Ch. 576 | |
2020-03-26 | Effective date(s) 03/19/2020 | |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2020-03-10 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2020-03-05 | House | Passed H., Ayes 80, Nays 8, PNV 4 |
2020-03-05 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2020-02-27 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 2/24/2020 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/19/2020 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2001 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 576