TN SB1960 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, designates as an unfair or deceptive act or practice under the Consumer Protection Act the failure of a broadband service provider to give a new consumer notice of the availability of parental control protections. - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 18 and Title 65, Chapter 5, Part 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, designates as an unfair or deceptive act or practice under the Consumer Protection Act the failure of a broadband service provider to give a new consumer notice of the availability of parental control protections. - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 18 and Title 65, Chapter 5, Part 2.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-01SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2018-01-31SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2018-01-29SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2689 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-07 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee of Consumer and Human Resources Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback