TN SB1956 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-31 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, creates a sales tax refund for a primary or secondary vehicle purchased in response to a natural disaster. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 3.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 3, relative to tax relief due to disasters.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-31SenateWithdrawn.
2024-01-31SenateRecalled from Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2024-01-29SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2024-01-25SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2024-01-24SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2009 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-31 - Withdrawn.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback