TN SB1954 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-29 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-29 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, provides that a victim-witness coordinator, in addition to the district attorney general, may inform a victim of a criminal offense of the victim's rights under the Tennessee Constitution, Article I, ยง 35, and of the dates of all future trial court proceedings involving the defendant. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 38.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 40, Chapter 38, relative to victims of crime.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-29 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2069 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-30 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee