TN SB1949 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1085
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1085
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the county mayor of each county, after taking charge of lands bought by the county at delinquent tax sales, to evaluate the property, within 90 to 120 days, and determine whether the value of the property or amount of money the county is likely to receive if the county sold the property exceeds the financial or environmental risks associated with the property; revises related provisions and establishes related requirements. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5, Part 25.
Title
As enacted, requires the county mayor of each county, after taking charge of lands bought by the county at delinquent tax sales, to evaluate the property, within 90 to 120 days, and determine whether the value of the property or amount of money the county is likely to receive if the county sold the property exceeds the financial or environmental risks associated with the property; revises related provisions and establishes related requirements. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5, Part 25.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-09 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-24 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1085 | |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/20/2016 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/20/2016 |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/19/2016 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Senate Reset on next to last calendar of 2016 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/7/2016 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/7/2016 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 2/29/2016 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 2/29/2016 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 2/22/2016 |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 2/22/2016 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 2/17/2016 |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/9/2016 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2343 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-24 - Pub. Ch. 1085