TN SB1944 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 719
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 719
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, classifies the offense of continuous sexual abuse of a child as a violent sexual offense for purposes of the Tennessee Sexual Offender and Violent Sexual Offender Registration, Verification and Tracking Act of 2004; revises the sentencing requirement for a person convicted of continuous sexual abuse of a child. - Amends TCA Section 39-13-518 and Title 40, Chapter 39, Part 2.
Title
As enacted, classifies the offense of continuous sexual abuse of a child as a violent sexual offense for purposes of the Tennessee Sexual Offender and Violent Sexual Offender Registration, Verification and Tracking Act of 2004; revises the sentencing requirement for a person convicted of continuous sexual abuse of a child. - Amends TCA Section 39-13-518 and Title 40, Chapter 39, Part 2.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 1 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-27 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-27 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Pub. Ch. 719 | |
2018-04-23 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2018 | |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2018-04-03 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 28, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0887) |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 3/29/2018 |
2018-03-26 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-03-26 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0887) |
2018-03-26 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2018-03-08 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 28, Nays 0 |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/5/2018 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2092 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 719