TN SB1940 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes certain medical professionals to prescribe hyperbaric oxygen therapy treatment for veterans with traumatic brain injury or post-traumatic stress disorder; adds hyperbaric oxygen therapy treatment as an authorized medical service that TennCare may provide for eligible veterans. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 1, Part 1 and Section 71-5-107.
Title
As introduced, authorizes certain medical professionals to prescribe hyperbaric oxygen therapy treatment for veterans with traumatic brain injury or post-traumatic stress disorder; adds hyperbaric oxygen therapy treatment as an authorized medical service that TennCare may provide for eligible veterans. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 1, Part 1 and Section 71-5-107.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/9/2020 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2405 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-02 - Taken off notice for cal. in Health Committee