TN SB1940 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-03 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-03 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows a parent or legal guardian of a minor to waive a claim against a person or entity for personal injury or death resulting from negligence related to an inherent risk of certain activities. - Amends TCA Title 29; Title 37 and Title 47.
Title
As introduced, allows a parent or legal guardian of a minor to waive a claim against a person or entity for personal injury or death resulting from negligence related to an inherent risk of certain activities. - Amends TCA Title 29; Title 37 and Title 47.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-03 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/3/2018 |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/2/2018 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/3/2018 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2095 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee