TN SB1939 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Effective date(s) 04/04/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, clarifies that an "occurrence," for purposes of the Mutual Aid and Emergency and Disaster Assistance Agreement Act of 2004, includes events that result in bodily injury or property damage; specifies the government officials through which mutual aid may be requested under the Act. - Amends TCA Title 58, Chapter 8.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 58, Chapter 8, relative to the Mutual Aid and Emergency and Disaster Assistance Agreement Act of 2004.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-08 Effective date(s) 04/04/2024
2024-04-08 Pub. Ch. 641
2024-04-04SenateSigned by Governor.
2024-03-26SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2024-03-26HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2024-03-20SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2024-03-20SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2024-03-18HousePassed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0
2024-03-18HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2024-02-29HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2024-02-26SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2024-02-26SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2024-02-23SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 2/26/2024
2024-02-20SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2024-02-20SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2024-02-13SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/20/2024
2024-01-29SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2024-01-25SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2024-01-24SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1919 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 641

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback