TN SB1935 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1004
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1004
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the secretary of state to establish a crime victim address confidentiality program for victims of domestic abuse, stalking, human trafficking, and sexual offenses; establishes how a substitute address may be used by a program participant in lieu of a confidential address. - Amends TCA Title 2; Title 10, Chapter 7; Title 39 and Title 40, Chapter 38.
Title
As enacted, requires the secretary of state to establish a crime victim address confidentiality program for victims of domestic abuse, stalking, human trafficking, and sexual offenses; establishes how a substitute address may be used by a program participant in lieu of a confidential address. - Amends TCA Title 2; Title 10, Chapter 7; Title 39 and Title 40, Chapter 38.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Kelsey [R] | Sen. Bill Ketron [R] | Sen. Paul Bailey [R] | Sen. Steven Dickerson [R] |
Sen. Ferrell Haile [R] | Sen. Bo Watson [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-18 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-18 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Pub. Ch. 1004 | |
2018-05-23 | Effective date(s) 05/21/2018; 03/01/2019 | |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2018-05-08 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-23 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-04-23 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA1255) |
2018-04-23 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0737) |
2018-04-23 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0666) |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2025 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1004