TN SB1925 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Pub. Ch. 647
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Pub. Ch. 647
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires state institutions of higher education to grant an excused absence to military reserve or national guard personnel for an absence due to mandatory military service; requires state institutions of higher education to permit military reserve and national guard personnel to withdraw or receive a grade of incomplete in any course if the service member is called to active duty while enrolled. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 7; Title 49, Chapter 8 and Title 49, Chapter 9.
Title
As enacted, requires state institutions of higher education to grant an excused absence to military reserve or national guard personnel for an absence due to mandatory military service; requires state institutions of higher education to permit military reserve and national guard personnel to withdraw or receive a grade of incomplete in any course if the service member is called to active duty while enrolled. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 7; Title 49, Chapter 8 and Title 49, Chapter 9.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-21 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-21 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | Pub. Ch. 647 | |
2018-04-11 | Effective date(s) 04/09/2018 | |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2018-03-29 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-03-26 | House | Passed H., Ayes 98, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-03-26 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2018-03-01 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 2/26/2018 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/21/2018 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 2/21/2018 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/14/2018 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2050 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 647