TN SB1916 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-24 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. C&L Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-24 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. C&L Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Save Tennessee Call Center Jobs Act". - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 12; Title 13; Title 47; Title 50 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Save Tennessee Call Center Jobs Act". - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 12; Title 13; Title 47; Title 50 and Title 67.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-24 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. C&L Comm. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Action Def. in S. C&L Comm. to 3/24/2014 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/20/2014 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/24/2014 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Action Def. in S. C&L Comm. to 3/20/2014 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/18/2014 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/18/2014 |
2014-01-27 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. C&L Comm. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2011 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-26 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Business and Utilities Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1916&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB1916.pdf |