TN SB1908 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-12 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-12 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a cemetery company offering to sell a grave space in a pre-need contract to offer the option to pre-pay for the interment right and interment services applicable to the space; requires the offer of an option to pre-pay for the interment right and interment services to include a written disclosure of the days of the week for which such services for the purchased interment right would be available without additional fees and that pre-paying for the interment right and interment services is not required but that the choice not to pre-pay will likely result in an increase to the purchase cost in the future. - Amends TCA Title 46 and Title 47.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 46 and Title 47, relative to cemeteries.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2026 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-12 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee of Commerce Committee