TN SB1903 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 742
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, defines food that contains a vaccine or vaccine material as a drug for purposes of the Tennessee Food, Drug and Cosmetic Act. - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 18 and Title 53.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 47, Chapter 18 and Title 53, relative to foods that contain certain substances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-01 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 742
2024-03-28SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2024-03-28SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2024-03-26SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/28/2024
2024-03-19SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2024-03-13SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/19/2024
2024-03-13SenateAction deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/20/2024
2024-03-06SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/13/2024
2024-03-06SenateAction deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/13/2024
2024-03-05SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2024-02-28SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/6/2024
2024-01-25SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
2024-01-24SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2024-01-23SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1894 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-01 - Effective date(s) 04/22/2024

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback