TN SB1903 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-05 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Jud. Comm
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-05 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Jud. Comm
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prevents uninsured motorists from receiving noneconomic damages or damages covering property loss for claims arising out of motor vehicle accidents except in certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 29; Title 55, Chapter 12 and Title 56.
Title
As introduced, prevents uninsured motorists from receiving noneconomic damages or damages covering property loss for claims arising out of motor vehicle accidents except in certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 29; Title 55, Chapter 12 and Title 56.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Jud. Comm |
2014-01-27 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2012 (Crossfiled) 2014-02-04 - Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1903&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB1903.pdf |