TN SB1901 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health & Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health & Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases the period within which a healthcare institution wishing to oppose a certificate of need application must file a written objection with the health services and development agency and serve a copy on the applicant's contact person, from 15 days to 20 days before the agency's meeting. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 68, Chapter 11.
Title
As introduced, increases the period within which a healthcare institution wishing to oppose a certificate of need application must file a written objection with the health services and development agency and serve a copy on the applicant's contact person, from 15 days to 20 days before the agency's meeting. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 68, Chapter 11.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health & Welfare Committee |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1911 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-31 - Assigned to s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee