TN SB1899 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Pub. Ch. 703
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Pub. Ch. 703
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes certain changes to the requirements for voluntary pre-k programs. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, makes certain changes to the requirements for voluntary pre-k programs. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 77 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 77 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Pub. Ch. 703 | |
2016-04-26 | Effective date(s) 04/06/2016 | |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2016-03-24 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2016-03-21 | House | Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2016-03-21 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0654) |
2016-03-21 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0653) |
2016-03-21 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2016-03-17 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 26, Nays 3 |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Amendment tabled (Amendment 3 - SA0726) |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0625) |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0624) |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/14/2016 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/14/2016 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/9/2016 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/9/2016 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/7/2016 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/2/2016 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1485 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 703